87S10203 JRJ-D By: Zaffirini S.J.R. No. 6 A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing a constitutional amendment establishing the Texas Redistricting Commission to redistrict the United States House of Representatives and the Texas Legislature. BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by adding Section 28a to read as follows: Sec. 28a. (a) The Texas Redistricting Commission exercises the legislative authority of this state to adopt redistricting plans for the election of members of the United States House of Representatives elected from this state, the Texas House of Representatives, and the Texas Senate. Districts for those legislative bodies may not be established or changed except as provided by this section. (b) The legislature shall provide by general law for the composition and operation of the Texas Redistricting Commission. (c) This section takes effect January 1, 2030. On that date, the Legislative Redistricting Board is abolished and Section 28 of this article is repealed. The Texas Redistricting Commission shall convene for the first time on the first business day after January 31, 2031. This subsection expires January 1, 2032. SECTION 2. Section 7a, Article V, Texas Constitution, is amended by amending Subsections (e) and (i) and adding Subsection (j) to read as follows: (e) Unless the legislature enacts a statewide reapportionment of the judicial districts following each federal decennial census, the board shall convene not later than the first Monday of June of the third year following the year in which the federal decennial census is taken to make a statewide reapportionment of the districts. The board shall complete its work on the reapportionment and file its order with the secretary of state not later than August 31 of the same year. If the Judicial Districts Board fails to make a statewide apportionment by that date, the Texas [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board] established by Article III, Section 28a [28], of this constitution shall convene on September 1 of the same year to make a statewide reapportionment of the judicial districts not later than the 90th [150th] day after the final day for the Judicial Districts Board to make the reapportionment. (i) The legislature, the Judicial Districts Board, or the Texas [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board] may not redistrict the judicial districts to provide for any judicial district smaller in size than an entire county except as provided by this section. Judicial districts smaller in size than the entire county may be created subsequent to a general election where a majority of the persons voting on the proposition adopt the proposition "to allow the division of ____________ County into judicial districts composed of parts of ____________ County." No redistricting plan may be proposed or adopted by the legislature, the Judicial Districts Board, or the Texas [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board] in anticipation of a future action by the voters of any county. (j) Until January 1, 2030, a reference in this section to the Texas Redistricting Commission means the Legislative Redistricting Board established under Article III, Section 28, of this constitution. This subsection expires January 1, 2031. SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021. The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the following proposition: "The constitutional amendment establishing the Texas Redistricting Commission to redistrict the United States House of Representatives and the Texas Legislature."