Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HB123 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 08/10/2021

                            By: Zwiener H.B. No. 123


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an increase in the amount of the exemption of residence
 homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district, a
 reduction in the amount of the limitation on school district ad
 valorem taxes imposed on the residence homesteads of the elderly or
 disabled to reflect the increased exemption amount, and the
 protection of school districts against the resulting loss in local
 revenue.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.13(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  An adult is entitled to exemption from taxation by a
 school district of $50,000 [$25,000] of the appraised value of the
 adult's residence homestead, except that only $5,000 of the
 exemption applies to an entity operating under former Chapter 17,
 18, 25, 26, 27, or 28, Education Code, as those chapters existed on
 May 1, 1995, as permitted by Section 11.301, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.26(a), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The tax officials shall appraise [the] property to which
 this section applies and calculate taxes as on other property, but
 if the tax [so] calculated exceeds the limitation imposed by this
 section, the tax imposed is the amount of the tax as limited by this
 section, except as otherwise provided by this section. A school
 district may not increase the total annual amount of ad valorem tax
 it imposes on the residence homestead of an individual 65 years of
 age or older or on the residence homestead of an individual who is
 disabled, as defined by Section 11.13, above the amount of the tax
 it imposed in the first tax year in which the individual qualified
 that residence homestead for the applicable exemption provided by
 Section 11.13(c) for an individual who is 65 years of age or older
 or is disabled. If the individual qualified that residence
 homestead for the exemption after the beginning of that first year
 and the residence homestead remains eligible for the same exemption
 for the next year, and if the school district taxes imposed on the
 residence homestead in the next year are less than the amount of
 taxes imposed in that first year, a school district may not
 subsequently increase the total annual amount of ad valorem taxes
 it imposes on the residence homestead above the amount it imposed in
 the year immediately following the first year for which the
 individual qualified that residence homestead for the same
 exemption, except as provided by Subsection (b). If the first tax
 year the individual qualified the residence homestead for the
 exemption provided by Section 11.13(c) for individuals 65 years of
 age or older or disabled was a tax year before the 2023 [2015] tax
 year, the amount of the limitation provided by this section for the
 2023 tax year is the amount of tax the school district imposed for
 the 2022 [2014] tax year less an amount equal to the amount
 determined by multiplying $25,000 [$10,000] times the tax rate of
 the school district for the 2023 [2015] tax year, plus any 2023
 [2015] tax attributable to improvements made in 2022 [2014], other
 than improvements made to comply with governmental regulations or
 repairs.
 SECTION 3.  Section 46.071, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsections
 (a-1), (b-1), and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning with the 2015-2016 school year and continuing
 through the 2022-2023 school year, a school district is entitled to
 additional state aid under this subchapter to the extent that state
 and local revenue used to service debt eligible under this chapter
 is less than the state and local revenue that would have been
 available to the district under this chapter as it existed on
 September 1, 2015, if the increase in the residence homestead
 exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 and the additional limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d)
 of that article as proposed by S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, had not occurred.
 (a-1)  Beginning with the 2023-2024 school year, a school
 district is entitled to additional state aid under this subchapter
 to the extent that state and local revenue used to service debt
 eligible under this chapter is less than the state and local revenue
 that would have been available to the district under this chapter as
 it existed on September 1, 2022, if any increase in the residence
 homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, and any additional limitation on tax increases under
 Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by the 87th Legislature,
 2nd Called Session, 2021, had not occurred.
 (b)  Subject to Subsections (c), (d), and (e) [(c)-(e)],
 additional state aid under this section through the 2022-2023
 school year is equal to the amount by which the loss of local
 interest and sinking revenue for debt service attributable to the
 increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c),
 Article VIII, Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on
 tax increases under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by
 S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is not offset by
 a gain in state aid under this chapter.
 (b-1)  Subject to Subsections (c-1), (d), and (e),
 additional state aid under this section beginning with the
 2023-2024 school year is equal to the amount by which the loss of
 local interest and sinking revenue for debt service attributable to
 any increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section
 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, and any additional
 limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d) of that article as
 proposed by the 87th Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2021, is not
 offset by a gain in state aid under this chapter.
 (c)  For the purpose of determining state aid under
 Subsections (a) and (b) [this section], local interest and sinking
 revenue for debt service is limited to revenue required to service
 debt eligible under this chapter as of September 1, 2015, including
 refunding of that debt, subject to Section 46.061. The limitation
 imposed by Section 46.034(a) does not apply for the purpose of
 determining state aid under this section.
 (c-1)  For the purpose of determining state aid under
 Subsections (a-1) and (b-1), local interest and sinking revenue for
 debt service is limited to revenue required to service debt
 eligible under this chapter as of September 1, 2022, including
 refunding of that debt, subject to Section 46.061. The limitation
 imposed by Section 46.034(a) does not apply for the purpose of
 determining state aid under this section.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter F, Chapter 48, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 48.2541 to read as follows:
 Sec. 48.2541.  ADDITIONAL STATE AID FOR HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION
 AND LIMITATION ON TAX INCREASES. (a) Beginning with the 2023-2024
 school year, a school district is entitled to additional state aid
 to the extent that state and local revenue under this chapter and
 Chapter 49 is less than the state and local revenue that would have
 been available to the district under this chapter and Chapter 49 as
 those chapters existed on September 1, 2022, if any increase in the
 residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, and any additional limitation on tax increases
 under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by the 87th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2021, had not occurred.
 (b)  The lesser of the school district's currently adopted
 maintenance and operations tax rate or the adopted maintenance and
 operations tax rate for the 2022 tax year is used for the purpose of
 determining additional state aid under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 11.13 and 11.26, Tax Code, apply only to an ad valorem tax year that
 begins on or after January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2023, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 87th Legislature,
 2nd Called Session, 2021, to increase the amount of the exemption of
 residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district
 and to reduce the amount of the limitation on school district ad
 valorem taxes imposed on the residence homesteads of the elderly or
 disabled to reflect the increased exemption amount is approved by
 the voters. If that constitutional amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.