Senate | 09/02/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Record vote RV#153 | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Amended 2-K. Bell, VanDeaver, K. King, Allison, Dutton, Huberty, Buckley, Lozano, and M. González | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Amended 1-Huberty | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 09/01/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 09/01/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 08/31/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 08/31/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 08/25/2021 | Filed |