|
09/09/2021
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
09/02/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/02/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
09/02/2021
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
09/02/2021
|
Record vote RV#148
|
|
|
House
|
09/02/2021
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
09/02/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
09/02/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#94
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Craddick and Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-Craddick
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amended 1-Landgraf
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
08/26/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/24/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/24/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|