Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HCR11 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.C.R. No. 11
1+By: Craddick H.C.R. No. 11
22
33
44 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
55 WHEREAS, All who shared in the life of Katharyn Carterette
66 Bock of New Braunfels were deeply saddened by her passing on
77 February 24, 2021, at the age of 80; and
88 WHEREAS, A native of Austin, the former Kathy Holmberg was
99 born to Elton Rodolph Holmberg and Carterette Dixon Holmberg on
1010 October 14, 1940; she grew up with the companionship of a brother,
1111 Norman, and graduated from Travis High School in 1958; in 1964, she
1212 was introduced to Bennie Bock II, whom she married on May 29, 1965;
1313 she became the proud mother of two daughters, Suzanne and Lucretia,
1414 and with the passing years, she had the pleasure of seeing her
1515 family grow to include two grandchildren, Rachel and Benjamin; and
1616 WHEREAS, Mrs. Bock demonstrated her business acumen as
1717 office manager and bookkeeper at her husband's law firm, and she was
1818 a stalwart supporter of Mr. Bock's political career, including his
1919 tenure with the Texas House of Representatives; active in her
2020 community, Mrs. Bock was a member of the Dittlinger Memorial
2121 Library board, the Comal County Courthouse Restoration Committee,
2222 and St. John's Episcopal Church vestry; and
2323 WHEREAS, Although Kathy Bock is greatly missed, this beloved
2424 woman has left her family and friends with many cherished memories,
2525 and she will forever hold a special place in their hearts; now,
2626 therefore, be it
2727 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas,
2828 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of Katharyn
2929 Carterette Bock and extend sincere condolences to the members of
3030 her family: to her husband, Bennie Bock; to her daughters, Suzanne
3131 Badger and her husband, Brian, and Lucretia Bock; to her
3232 grandchildren, Rachel and Benjamin Badger; to her brother, Norman
3333 Holmberg; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further
3434 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
3535 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
3636 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
3737 Kathy Bock.
38- Craddick
39- ______________________________ ______________________________
40- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
41- I certify that H.C.R. No. 11 was unanimously adopted by a
42- rising vote of the House on August 30, 2021.
43- ______________________________
44- Chief Clerk of the House
45- I certify that H.C.R. No. 11 was unanimously adopted by a
46- rising vote of the Senate on August 31, 2021.
47- ______________________________
48- Secretary of the Senate
49- APPROVED: __________________
50- Date
51- __________________
52- Governor