09/17/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
09/03/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 09/02/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 09/01/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 09/01/2021 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 08/31/2021 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 08/30/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 08/23/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 08/16/2021 | Filed |