Texas 2021 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR42 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/02/2021

                    H.R. No. 42


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The thousands of deaths caused by COVID-19 in Texas
 have created a tremendous void in families, communities, and
 workplaces throughout the state; among those who lost their lives
 in the pandemic was Dorothy Sue Caylor, a dedicated and
 well-respected employee of the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice, who passed away on December 17, 2020, at the age of 62; and
 WHEREAS, Dorothy Caylor was born in Dallas on June 12, 1958;
 she worked for West Georgia National Bank for 19 years, before
 returning to Texas and beginning her 15-year career with the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice; she married William Caylor on
 December 23, 2006, and her treasured family included her daughter,
 Jamie, her two stepdaughters, Tonya and Crystal, and her four
 grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Since 2005, Ms. Caylor had worked as a human
 resources specialist at the Roach Unit in Childress; she enjoyed a
 warm rapport with her colleagues, and she was known for her love of
 people, particularly children, and her affinity for baking; and
 WHEREAS, Dorothy Caylor faithfully and ably performed her
 duties throughout her tenure with the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice, and she will long be remembered with great admiration by
 all who were privileged to know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Dorothy Sue Caylor and extend deepest sympathy to her family,
 friends, and colleagues; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Dorothy
 Caylor.
 Murr
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 42 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on August 30, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House