Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR62 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 62
1+87S20598 BK-D
2+ By: Guillen H.R. No. 62
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, Over the course of their lives, Lucila and Rodolfo
67 Cantu shared an enduring love story, and their family is
78 celebrating the couple's legacy as they reflect on the passing of
89 Mrs. Cantu on May 15, 2019, at the age of 72, and on the passing of
910 Mr. Cantu on September 14, 2016, at the age of 71; and
1011 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Cantu enjoyed a long and rewarding
1112 marriage that spanned five decades; they devotedly raised three
1213 sons, Robert, Richard, and Rudy, and their cherished family later
1314 grew to include numerous grandchildren and a great-grandson; and
1415 WHEREAS, The son of Pedro and Theresa Cantu, Roy Cantu was
1516 born in Los Fresnos on March 9, 1945, and he grew up with four
1617 brothers, Hector, Arturo, Oscar, and Joel; he graduated from Los
1718 Fresnos High School in 1964 and went on to serve in the U.S. Air
1819 Force, where he attained the rank of staff sergeant before
1920 receiving an honorable discharge in 1969; he attended Texas
2021 Southmost College in Brownsville, Miami Dade Junior College, Texas
2122 A&I University, and Pan American University; and
2223 WHEREAS, Mr. Cantu began his career at the Bank of South
2324 Texas in Alice and subsequently held a number of leadership
2425 positions with First National Bank in Rio Grande City,
2526 International Bank of Commerce, and Lone Star National Bank; he
2627 then worked for the City of McAllen, where he served as director of
2728 the EB5 program for the McAllen Economic Development Corporation,
2829 and in his final years, he was employed with Best Health Home Care
2930 Company Incorporated; and
3031 WHEREAS, The former Lucy Silva was born in Salineno on
3132 September 15, 1946, to Juan and Teresa Silva, and she grew up with
3233 the companionship of three siblings, Eloy, Lilia, and Idalia; after
3334 graduating from McAllen High School in 1965, she attended Texas A&I
3435 University and Pan American University; she went on to work for more
3536 than 15 years at her son's firm, the Law Office of Richard A. Cantu,
3637 P.C.; and
3738 WHEREAS, The couple were also deeply involved in their
3839 community; Mr. Cantu was a former president of the Rio Grande City
3940 Rotary Club, the Immaculate Conception Parent-Teacher
4041 Organization, and the Starr County Youth Fair Association, as well
4142 as a member of the Rio Grande City Chamber of Commerce and Knights
4243 of Columbus; Mrs. Cantu served in the Florence J. Scott Study Club,
4344 Beta Sigma Phi Sorority, Red Hatter's Club, Bunco Club, and several
4445 parent-teacher organizations; together, they belonged to the Lions
4546 Club of Alice, the International Order of Alhambra, and Club de
4647 Amistad; and
4748 WHEREAS, Roy and Lucy Cantu set an inspiring example through
4849 their great devotion to each other and to their family, and they
4950 will forever hold a special place in the hearts of all those who
5051 held them dear; now, therefore, be it
5152 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
5253 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
5354 of Lucila and Rodolfo Cantu and extend heartfelt sympathy to their
5455 loved ones; and, be it further
5556 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
5657 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
5758 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Roy and
5859 Lucy Cantu.
59- Guillen
60- ______________________________
61- Speaker of the House
62- I certify that H.R. No. 62 was unanimously adopted by a rising
63- vote of the House on August 30, 2021.
64- ______________________________
65- Chief Clerk of the House