Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB13 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 13
1+By: Huffman, et al. S.B. No. 13
2+ (Hunter)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to dates of certain elections to be held in 2022.
68 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
79 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 41, Election Code, is
810 amended by adding Section 41.0075 to read as follows:
911 Sec. 41.0075. PRIMARY ELECTION: TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)
1012 This section supersedes any conflicting statute with respect to a
1113 primary election to be held in 2022.
1214 (b) For the purposes of this section, a redistricting plan
1315 "becomes law" on the earlier of:
1416 (1) the date the governor signs an Act of the 87th
1517 Legislature relating to the composition of the State Board of
1618 Education, state legislative, or federal congressional districts;
1719 or
1820 (2) the date on which the time for gubernatorial
1921 action on an Act of the 87th Legislature relating to the composition
2022 of the State Board of Education, state legislative, or federal
2123 congressional districts expires under Section 14, Article IV, Texas
2224 Constitution.
2325 (c) If a redistricting plan adopted following the 2020
2426 federal census by the legislature that includes a State Board of
2527 Education, state legislative, or federal congressional district
2628 becomes law:
2729 (1) on or before November 15, 2021, the following
2830 dates related to the primary election for the election of officers
2931 for the district shall apply:
3032 (A) an application for a place on the general
3133 primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than November 29,
3234 2021, and not later than 6 p.m. on December 13, 2021;
3335 (B) the general primary election date is March 1,
3436 2022; and
3537 (C) the runoff primary election date is May 24,
3638 2022;
3739 (2) after November 15, 2021, and on or before December
3840 28, 2021, the following dates related to the primary election for
3941 the election of officers for the district shall apply:
4042 (A) an application for a place on the general
4143 primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than January 10,
4244 2022, and not later than 6 p.m. on January 24, 2022;
4345 (B) the general primary election date is April 5,
4446 2022; and
4547 (C) the runoff primary election date is June 21,
4648 2022; and
4749 (3) after December 28, 2021, and on or before February
4850 7, 2022, the following dates related to the primary election for the
4951 election of officers for the district shall apply:
5052 (A) an application for a place on the general
5153 primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than February 21,
5254 2022, and not later than 6 p.m. on March 7, 2022;
5355 (B) the general primary election date is May 24,
5456 2022; and
5557 (C) the runoff primary election date is July 26,
5658 2022.
5759 (d) If a plan for a State Board of Education, state
5860 legislative, or federal congressional district becomes law on dates
5961 included under more than one subdivision of Subsection (c), the
6062 latest dates provided for the filing period and the general and
6163 runoff primary elections of all of the subdivisions applicable to
6264 the effective date of a plan shall apply. The county chair shall
6365 conduct the drawing to determine the order of the candidates' names
6466 on the general primary election ballot in accordance with Section
6567 172.082(c) after the date of the applicable filing deadline.
6668 (e) If a redistricting plan to which this section applies
6769 has not become law on or before February 7, 2022, the secretary of
6870 state shall set the dates of the filing period and the general and
6971 runoff primary elections for the election of officers of the
7072 districts to which this section applies. In setting dates under
7173 this subsection, the secretary of state shall ensure the efficient
7274 and orderly administration of elections and shall, to the extent
7375 practicable, set dates in a manner that allows the same interval of
7476 time in relation to the date of the election as would be provided by
7577 the application of other law.
76- (f) Except as provided by Subsection (h), a date set for the
77- filing period or the general primary election under Subsection (c)
78- or (d) shall be the date of any filing period provided under this
79- code or of any general primary election held under this code.
78+ (f) A date set for the filing period or the general primary
79+ election under Subsection (c) or (d) shall be the date of any filing
80+ period provided under this code or of any general primary election
81+ held under this code.
8082 (g) Except as provided by this section, the secretary of
8183 state shall adjust the schedule for canvassing election returns,
8284 declaring results, or performing any other official act relating to
8385 an election held on a date under this section as necessary for the
8486 efficient and orderly administration of the election. To the
8587 extent practicable, the secretary of state shall adjust schedules
8688 under this subsection in a manner that allows the same interval of
8789 time in relation to the date of the election as would be provided by
8890 the application of other law.
89- (h) Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, an
90- election for the office of precinct chair held in 2022 shall be held
91- on the same date as the runoff primary election held in 2022 and the
92- precinct chair shall be elected by plurality vote. The secretary of
93- state shall set the dates of the filing period for the election of
94- the precinct chair and shall adjust the schedule for performing any
95- official act relating to an election held under this subsection as
96- necessary for the efficient and orderly administration of the
97- election.
98- (i) This section expires January 1, 2023.
91+ (h) This section expires January 1, 2023.
9992 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
10093 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
10194 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
10295 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
10396 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
10497 legislative session.
105- ______________________________ ______________________________
106- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
107- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 13 passed the Senate on
108- August 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 1; and that
109- the Senate concurred in House amendment on August 29, 2021, by the
110- following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
111- ______________________________
112- Secretary of the Senate
113- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 13 passed the House, with
114- amendment, on August 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 96,
115- Nays 25, one present not voting.
116- ______________________________
117- Chief Clerk of the House
118- Approved:
119- ______________________________
120- Date
121- ______________________________
122- Governor