Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB14 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 6, 2021

Engrossed

Bill August 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis August 26, 2021
Analysis August 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note August 26, 2021
Fiscal Note August 19, 2021
Fiscal Note August 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill August 9, 2021