09/17/2021 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2022 | |||
09/17/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
Senate | 08/31/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
08/30/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 08/30/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 08/29/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 08/27/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 08/27/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 08/27/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 08/27/2021 | Record vote RV#62 | ||
House | 08/27/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 08/27/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 08/25/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 08/24/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 08/24/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 08/23/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 08/23/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 08/23/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 08/23/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 08/23/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 08/19/2021 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 08/19/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
House | 08/19/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 08/07/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 08/07/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 08/07/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 08/07/2021 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 08/07/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 08/06/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 08/06/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |