Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB9 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill August 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis September 9, 2021
Analysis August 31, 2021
Analysis August 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note September 2, 2021
Fiscal Note August 31, 2021
Fiscal Note August 23, 2021
Fiscal Note August 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill September 1, 2021
Bill August 7, 2021