Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SJR9 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Zaffirini S.J.R. No. 9
22
33
44 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
55 proposing a constitutional amendment establishing the Texas
66 Redistricting Commission to redistrict the United States House of
77 Representatives and the Texas Legislature.
88 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
1010 adding Section 28a to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 28a. (a) The Texas Redistricting Commission exercises
1212 the legislative authority of this state to adopt redistricting
1313 plans for the election of members of the United States House of
1414 Representatives elected from this state, the Texas House of
1515 Representatives, and the Texas Senate. Districts for those
1616 legislative bodies may not be established or changed except as
1717 provided by this section.
1818 (b) The legislature shall provide by general law for the
1919 composition and operation of the Texas Redistricting Commission.
2020 (c) This section takes effect January 1, 2030. On that
2121 date, the Legislative Redistricting Board is abolished and Section
2222 28 of this article is repealed. The Texas Redistricting Commission
2323 shall convene for the first time on the first business day after
2424 January 31, 2031. This subsection expires January 1, 2032.
2525 SECTION 2. Section 7a, Article V, Texas Constitution, is
2626 amended by amending Subsections (e) and (i) and adding Subsection
2727 (j) to read as follows:
2828 (e) Unless the legislature enacts a statewide
2929 reapportionment of the judicial districts following each federal
3030 decennial census, the board shall convene not later than the first
3131 Monday of June of the third year following the year in which the
3232 federal decennial census is taken to make a statewide
3333 reapportionment of the districts. The board shall complete its
3434 work on the reapportionment and file its order with the secretary of
3535 state not later than August 31 of the same year. If the Judicial
3636 Districts Board fails to make a statewide apportionment by that
3737 date, the Texas [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board]
3838 established by Article III, Section 28a [28], of this constitution
3939 shall convene on September 1 of the same year to make a statewide
4040 reapportionment of the judicial districts not later than the 90th
4141 [150th] day after the final day for the Judicial Districts Board to
4242 make the reapportionment.
4343 (i) The legislature, the Judicial Districts Board, or the
4444 Texas [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board] may not
4545 redistrict the judicial districts to provide for any judicial
4646 district smaller in size than an entire county except as provided by
4747 this section. Judicial districts smaller in size than the entire
4848 county may be created subsequent to a general election where a
4949 majority of the persons voting on the proposition adopt the
5050 proposition "to allow the division of _______________ County into
5151 judicial districts composed of parts of _______________ County."
5252 No redistricting plan may be proposed or adopted by the
5353 legislature, the Judicial Districts Board, or the Texas
5454 [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board] in anticipation of
5555 a future action by the voters of any county.
5656 (j) Until January 1, 2030, a reference in this section to
5757 the Texas Redistricting Commission means the Legislative
5858 Redistricting Board established under Article III, Section 28, of
5959 this constitution. This subsection expires January 1, 2031.
6060 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
6161 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
6262 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
6363 following proposition: "The constitutional amendment
6464 establishing the Texas Redistricting Commission to redistrict the
6565 United States House of Representatives and the Texas Legislature."