Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR59 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/02/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 59
 In Memory
 of
 Willie Fae Atkinson
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Florence in mourning the loss of Willie Fae Atkinson,
 who died July 2, 2021, at the age of 95; and
 WHEREAS, A Williamson County native, Willie Fae Reagor was
 born in her family's home on January 30, 1926; she began her
 education in Andice, Texas, and then transferred to Florence
 schools when the Andice School House closed; and
 WHEREAS, On May 25, 1945, Willie Fae married her lifelong
 love, Tom Atkinson; his military career took them to Rhode Island
 and Pennsylvania, and at the end of World War II, they relocated
 to College Station, where Tom attended Texas A&M University and
 Willie Fae worked as a telephone switchboard operator for Bryan
 Field; and
 WHEREAS, Upon Tom's graduation, the couple settled near
 Florence and began raising livestock; they were blessed with four
 children, and their 11 grandchildren and 10 great-grandchildren
 enriched her life immeasurably; and
 WHEREAS, Willie Fae took great joy in serving as a steward
 of her cherished community; she was the first female to serve on
 the Florence Independent School Board as a write-in candidate,
 and she served in numerous leadership positions during her 70
 years as a congregant of the Florence Methodist Church; she
 served as a Girl Scout leader and held several offices with the
 Home Demonstration Club, and she was a delegate to the State Farm
 Bureau Convention; and
 WHEREAS, She was a woman of many talents, and she passed on
 her masterful skill as a seamstress to her daughters and
 granddaughters; she touched the lives of many through her loving
 spirit, and she enjoyed sharing the beautiful flowers and
 vegetables from her gardens with her family and friends; she was
 a treasured citizen, and she will long be remembered with respect
 and admiration by all who were privileged to share in her life;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby extend sincere
 condolences to the bereaved family of Willie Fae Atkinson; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Willie Fae Atkinson.
 Buckingham
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on September 2, 2021,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate