Senate
|
10/15/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#94
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 1-Wilson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 21-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 8, Section 4
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 21-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 20-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 18-Gervin-Hawkins, et al.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment amended 19-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 18-Gervin-Hawkins, Guillen, Minjarez, Campos, and Allison
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 17-White
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 15-Gates
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment amended 16-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 15-Gates
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 14-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 13-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 12-Schaefer and E. Morales
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 11-Ashby and E. Morales
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 10-Walle
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 6, Section 16(f)
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 9-Slaton
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 8-Walle
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 7-Jetton
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 6-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 5-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 4-VanDeaver
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Wilson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment amended 3-Raney
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment amended 2-Wilson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Wilson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|