Senate
|
10/15/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#95
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 14-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 8, Section 4
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 14-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 13-Dominguez
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 12-Minjarez, Gervin-Hawkins, and Campos
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 11-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 10-E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 8-Raney and Shine
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 6-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment amended 7-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 6-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 5-Allison, Minjarez, and Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 4-J.E. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 3-Coleman
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 2-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 1-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|