Texas 2021 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HCR10 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/06/2021

                    H.C.R. No. 10


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The life of a distinguished public servant drew to a
 close with the death of former state representative Roberto
 Gutierrez of McAllen on December 28, 2019, at the age of 83; and
 WHEREAS, Roberto Gutierrez was born on June 11, 1936;
 answering his nation's call to duty, he served in the 49th Armored
 Division of the U.S. Army, rising to the rank of sergeant, and he
 went on to serve another 10 years in the Texas National Guard; in
 civilian life, he earned a master's degree in education and enjoyed
 a career as a secondary school teacher and counselor and as a
 businessman; and
 WHEREAS, First elected to the State Legislature from
 District 41 in 1990, Representative Gutierrez served for 14 years,
 and he devoted his tenure in office to expanding education in the
 Rio Grande Valley, promoting public safety, and improving access to
 health services; he was a member of the Appropriations, Public
 Safety, and Financial Institutions Committees, among others, and
 his many achievements included authoring the bill that created
 South Texas Community College, helping to increase funding for The
 University of Texas-Pan American, promoting an early diabetes
 detection program for children, and playing a lead role in creating
 the UT Regional Academic Health Center, which served as the
 foundation for the UTRGV School of Medicine; and
 WHEREAS, Representative Gutierrez shared a loving union with
 his wife, Cecilia Carmen Gutierrez, that spanned 56 years until her
 death in 2017, and he was the proud father of three children,
 Roberto, Gilda, and Sara; with the passing years, he had the
 pleasure of welcoming into his family seven grandchildren, Roberto
 Daniel, A. Cecilia, Iris Isabelle, Joel Roberto, Sarita Cecilia,
 Gabriela Marie, and Andrea Renee; and
 WHEREAS, Living up to his motto "dale gas," which is Spanish
 for "go forward," Roberto Gutierrez led a rich and purposeful life
 dedicated to the service of others, and he leaves behind a legacy
 that will continue to inspire all those who knew and loved him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas,
 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory of the
 Honorable Roberto Gutierrez and extend heartfelt sympathy to his
 family and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Roberto Gutierrez.
 Guerra
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 10 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on September 30, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 10 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on October 4, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor