Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR277 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/26/2021

                            H.R. No. 277


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of The University of Texas at El Paso
 president emerita Dr. Diana Natalicio on September 24, 2021, at the
 age of 82, has deeply saddened the many people whose lives were
 touched by her inspiring leadership and steadfast commitment to
 education; and
 WHEREAS, Born in St. Louis on August 25, 1939, Diana
 Natalicio received her bachelor's degree in Spanish from Saint
 Louis University and her master's degree in Portuguese and
 doctorate in linguistics from The University of Texas at Austin;
 she joined UTEP as an assistant professor of linguistics in 1971,
 and after serving as chair of the modern languages department, dean
 of liberal arts, and vice president for academic affairs, she
 became the 10th president of the university on February 11, 1988,
 and the first woman to hold the office; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of her extraordinary 31-year tenure
 as president, Dr. Natalicio helped raise UTEP enrollment from
 nearly 15,000 to more than 25,000 students, and she helped increase
 the population of Mexican American students to 80 percent of the
 student body; under her dynamic leadership, the school's annual
 budget increased from $65 million to almost $450 million, and she
 oversaw a tenfold increase in research spending; the school also
 increased the number of its doctoral programs from one in 1988 to 22
 in 2019, and that same year, UTEP was named a top-tier R1 doctoral
 research university by the Carnegie Classification of Institutions
 of Higher Education; Dr. Natalicio retired in August 2019; and
 WHEREAS, A world-renowned leader in her profession,
 Dr. Natalicio was appointed by President George H. W. Bush to the
 Advisory Commission on Educational Excellence for Hispanic
 Americans and by President Bill Clinton to the National Science
 Board, which she served for 12 years, including three terms as vice
 chair; she also sat on the boards of the Hispanic Scholarship Fund,
 The Rockefeller Foundation, the American Council on Education, the
 National Action Council for Minorities in Engineering, the
 Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, and the
 U.S.-Mexico Foundation for Science, among many others; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Natalicio's numerous honors included the
 Conquistador Award from the City of El Paso, the Academic
 Leadership Award from Carnegie Corporation of New York, the Orden
 Mexicana del Águila Azteca from the president of Mexico, the
 TIAA-CREF Theodore M. Hesburgh Award for Leadership Excellence,
 the Harold W. McGraw, Jr. Prize in Education, and induction into
 the Texas Women's Hall of Fame; in 2017, Fortune magazine named her
 one of the World's 50 Greatest Leaders, and in 2016, she was
 included in Time magazine's list of the 100 Most Influential
 People; she received honorary doctorates from universities around
 the world; and
 WHEREAS, Through her trailblazing achievements and numerous
 civic contributions, Diana Natalicio made a lasting, positive
 difference in the lives of countless students, and she will forever
 be remembered with deep admiration by all who were privileged to
 know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Dr. Diana Natalicio and extend heartfelt sympathy to her loved
 ones and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Dr. Diana
 Natalicio.
 Ortega
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 277 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on October 18, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House