Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR299 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/19/2021

                            H.R. No. 299


 R E S O L U T I O N
 BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the State of
 Texas, 87th Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 2021, That House Rule
 13, Section 9(a), be suspended in part as provided by House Rule 13,
 Section 9(f), to enable the conference committee appointed to
 resolve the differences on Senate Bill 1 (an increase in the amount
 of the exemption of residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation
 by a school district and the protection of school districts against
 the resulting loss in local revenue) to consider and take action on
 the following matter:
 House Rule 13, Section 9(a)(4), is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not included in either the house
 or senate version of the bill by adding the following new SECTIONS
 to the bill:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.13(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  An adult is entitled to exemption from taxation by a
 school district of $40,000 [$25,000] of the appraised value of the
 adult's residence homestead, except that only $5,000 of the
 exemption applies to an entity operating under former Chapter 17,
 18, 25, 26, 27, or 28, Education Code, as those chapters existed on
 May 1, 1995, as permitted by Section 11.301, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 46.071, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsections
 (a-1), (b-1), and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning with the 2015-2016 school year and continuing
 through the 2021-2022 school year, a school district is entitled to
 additional state aid under this subchapter to the extent that state
 and local revenue used to service debt eligible under this chapter
 is less than the state and local revenue that would have been
 available to the district under this chapter as it existed on
 September 1, 2015, if the increase in the residence homestead
 exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 and the additional limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d)
 of that article as proposed by S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, had not occurred.
 (a-1)  Beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, a school
 district is entitled to additional state aid under this subchapter
 to the extent that state and local revenue used to service debt
 eligible under this chapter is less than the state and local revenue
 that would have been available to the district under this chapter as
 it existed on September 1, 2021, if any increase in the residence
 homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, as proposed by the 87th Legislature, 3rd Called
 Session, 2021, had not occurred.
 (b)  Subject to Subsections (c), (d), and (e) [(c)-(e)],
 additional state aid under this section through the 2021-2022
 school year is equal to the amount by which the loss of local
 interest and sinking revenue for debt service attributable to the
 increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c),
 Article VIII, Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on
 tax increases under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by
 S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is not offset by
 a gain in state aid under this chapter.
 (b-1)  Subject to Subsections (c-1), (d), and (e),
 additional state aid under this section beginning with the
 2022-2023 school year is equal to the amount by which the loss of
 local interest and sinking revenue for debt service attributable to
 any increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section
 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, as proposed by the 87th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 2021, is not offset by a gain in
 state aid under this chapter.
 (c)  For the purpose of determining state aid under
 Subsections (a) and (b) [this section], local interest and sinking
 revenue for debt service is limited to revenue required to service
 debt eligible under this chapter as of September 1, 2015, including
 refunding of that debt, subject to Section 46.061. The limitation
 imposed by Section 46.034(a) does not apply for the purpose of
 determining state aid under this section.
 (c-1)  For the purpose of determining state aid under
 Subsections (a-1) and (b-1), local interest and sinking revenue for
 debt service is limited to revenue required to service debt
 eligible under this chapter as of September 1, 2021, including
 refunding of that debt, subject to Section 46.061. The limitation
 imposed by Section 46.034(a) does not apply for the purpose of
 determining state aid under this section.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 48, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 48.2543 to read as follows:
 Sec. 48.2543.  ADDITIONAL STATE AID FOR HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION.
 (a) Beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, a school district is
 entitled to additional state aid to the extent that state and local
 revenue under this chapter and Chapter 49 is less than the state and
 local revenue that would have been available to the district under
 this chapter and Chapter 49 as those chapters existed on September
 1, 2021, if any increase in the residence homestead exemption under
 Section 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, as proposed by
 the 87th Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 2021, had not occurred.
 (b)  The lesser of the school district's currently adopted
 maintenance and operations tax rate or the adopted maintenance and
 operations tax rate for the 2021 tax year is used for the purpose of
 determining additional state aid under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 4.  The comptroller of public accounts may adopt
 rules for the purpose of implementing and administering the changes
 in law made by this Act, including rules relating to the form of
 certain information required to be provided by tax officials and
 the date on which the information must be provided.
 SECTION 5.  Section 11.13, Tax Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies beginning with the 2022 tax year.
 Explanation: The addition is necessary to increase the amount
 of the exemption of residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation
 by a school district from $25,000 to $40,000, protect school
 districts against the resulting loss in local revenue, authorize
 the comptroller of public accounts to adopt rules to implement the
 change in law made by Senate Bill 1, and provide that the change in
 law made by Senate Bill 1 to Section 11.13, Tax Code, takes effect
 beginning with the 2022 tax year.
 Meyer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 299 was adopted by the House on
 October 18, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House