Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB47 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill October 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill October 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note October 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis October 2, 2021