House | 10/14/2021 | Record vote RV#82 | ||
House | 10/14/2021 | Failed of adoption | ||
House | 10/14/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 10/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Record vote RV#61 | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 10/12/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
House | 10/04/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 10/01/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 10/01/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 09/28/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 09/28/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 09/28/2021 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 09/23/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Ordered not printed | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Printing rule suspended | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |