Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2022
Bill December 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023