House | 04/20/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 500 | Journal Page: 1767 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Postponed | 4/20/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1502 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1502 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Postponed | 4/17/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1327 |
House | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1327 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 913 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 414 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 414 | |
House | 12/16/2022 | Filed |