E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective on 1/1/24
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6485
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 123
|
Journal Page: 3107
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 123
|
Journal Page: 5580
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2143
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 772
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 993
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#76
|
Journal Page: 992
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Record vote RV#76
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 992
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Goldman
|
Journal Page: 979
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 417
|
House
|
12/20/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|