Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1354 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | RV#532 | Journal Page: 2079 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2079 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2079 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 418 | |
House | 12/20/2022 | Filed |