House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 1502 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 418 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 418 | |
House | 12/21/2022 | Filed |