Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB108 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

                    By: Cortez, Morales of Maverick H.B. No. 108
 (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 4, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 108 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for certain
 classroom teachers and retired classroom teachers; imposing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 504.517 and 504.518 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 504.517.  CLASSROOM TEACHERS. (a) In this section,
 "classroom teacher" has the meaning assigned by Section 5.001,
 Education Code.
 (b)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 classroom teachers with at least 15 years of service teaching
 public school students. The license plates must include the words
 "Texas Teacher" and depict a Texas public education logo. The
 department shall design the license plates in consultation with the
 Texas Education Agency.
 (c)  The fee for issuance of the license plates is $10.
 Sec. 504.518.  RETIRED CLASSROOM TEACHERS. (a) In this
 section, "retired classroom teacher" means a person who:
 (1)  was formerly employed as a classroom teacher, as
 that term is defined by Section 5.001, Education Code; and
 (2)  is a retiree of the Teacher Retirement System of
 Texas.
 (b)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 retired classroom teachers with at least 20 years of service
 teaching public school students. The license plates must include
 the words "Retired Texas Teacher" and depict a Texas public
 education logo. The department shall design the license plates in
 consultation with the Texas Education Agency.
 (c)  The fee for issuance of the license plates is $5.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *