Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1958
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1958
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1580
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1958
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
House
|
12/29/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|