Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1071
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#329
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1627
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#300
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Harrison, Toth, Swanson, Troxclair, Orr, Vasut, Isaac, Leo-Wilson, Schaefer, Hayes, More
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 424
|
House
|
12/29/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|