Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1616 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3469 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3280 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1189 | Journal Page: 3279 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3279 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3279 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Amended | 1-Vo | Journal Page: 3170 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 424 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 424 | |
House | 01/03/2023 | Filed |