House | 04/25/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1976 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 349 | Journal Page: 1976 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Postponed | 4/25/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1849 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1849 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Postponed | 4/24/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1615 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1344 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 425 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 425 | |
House | 01/03/2023 | Filed |