Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023
Bill January 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis April 29, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023