Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1197 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#345 | Journal Page: 1733 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1286 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 426 | |
House | 01/03/2023 | Filed |