LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1186
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1186
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1186
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/15/2023
8:00 am
Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.014
HB219
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB264
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Received from the House
HB1038
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1393
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1455
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1666
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1748
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HCR20
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HJR20
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
HB1095
Introduced
Last Action: 03/15/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
HB1186
Introduced
Last Action: 03/15/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule