Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1206 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 6, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2023