Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1208 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2023
Fiscal Note April 8, 2023