E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/18/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2051
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4549
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1895
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1895
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1895
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1895
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1895
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1747
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#363
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1699
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1699
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|