Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 24, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 19, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023