Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1229 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023