House | 04/27/2023 | Returned to committee by Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Returned to Calendars Committee | Journal Page: 2178 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Point of order sustained | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 2177 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 436 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
House | 01/09/2023 | Filed |