House | 05/09/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 01/10/2023 | Filed |