1 | 1 | | 88R3927 LRM-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Jetton H.B. No. 1259 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to studies and reports regarding public-private |
---|
8 | 8 | | partnerships and funding for certain public projects, including |
---|
9 | 9 | | transportation projects. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter P, Chapter 201, Transportation Code, |
---|
12 | 12 | | is amended by adding Section 201.9931 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 201.9931. UNIFIED TRANSPORTATION PROGRAM FUNDING |
---|
14 | 14 | | REPORT. (a) Not later than October 1 of each year, the department |
---|
15 | 15 | | shall submit to each member of the legislature a report on the |
---|
16 | 16 | | historical, current, and projected funding in the unified |
---|
17 | 17 | | transportation program. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) The report must: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) if submitted in 2023: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (A) include the amounts in each defined program |
---|
21 | 21 | | funding category for fiscal years 2004 through 2031; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | (B) use actual funding amounts for fiscal years |
---|
23 | 23 | | 2004 through 2023 and projected funding amounts for fiscal years |
---|
24 | 24 | | 2024 through 2031; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) if submitted in 2024: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (A) include the amounts in Subdivision (1)(A) |
---|
27 | 27 | | updated to reflect funding allocations made in the 2025 unified |
---|
28 | 28 | | transportation program through fiscal year 2032; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (B) use actual funding amounts for fiscal years |
---|
30 | 30 | | 2004 through 2024 and projected funding amounts for fiscal years |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2025 through 2032; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (3) provide the total amount committed under the |
---|
33 | 33 | | program for the year the report is submitted; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (4) for each fiscal year required to be reported, |
---|
35 | 35 | | provide a breakdown by each defined program funding category: |
---|
36 | 36 | | (A) of the amount allocated to the funding |
---|
37 | 37 | | category and the funding category's percentage of the total funding |
---|
38 | 38 | | amount; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (B) of the amount allocated to each department |
---|
40 | 40 | | district and metropolitan planning organization, if applicable; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (5) for defined funding category 12, Strategic |
---|
42 | 42 | | Priority, provide an explanation of the methodology used to |
---|
43 | 43 | | prioritize project funding in fiscal year 2004 and subsequent |
---|
44 | 44 | | fiscal years, including an explanation of any updates or changes to |
---|
45 | 45 | | the methodology; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (6) be delivered in portable document format (PDF) and |
---|
47 | 47 | | a format compatible with Microsoft Excel. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (c) This section expires December 1, 2024. |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 2. (a) The comptroller of public accounts, in |
---|
50 | 50 | | conjunction with the Texas Department of Transportation and the |
---|
51 | 51 | | Texas Water Development Board, shall conduct a study on the |
---|
52 | 52 | | economic impact and feasibility of public-private partnerships as |
---|
53 | 53 | | an alternative delivery method for certain projects of the |
---|
54 | 54 | | department and board, including the potential economic impact if |
---|
55 | 55 | | those public-private partnerships file for bankruptcy. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (b) In conducting the study, the comptroller shall analyze |
---|
57 | 57 | | each project submitted under Subsection (c) of this section and |
---|
58 | 58 | | determine for each project: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (1) the feasibility of using an alternative project |
---|
60 | 60 | | delivery method, including the use of private financing; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (2) the estimated savings to this state if the project |
---|
62 | 62 | | is completed using an alternative project delivery method, |
---|
63 | 63 | | including private financing; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (3) the estimated amount of local money necessary to |
---|
65 | 65 | | construct or complete the project using traditional project |
---|
66 | 66 | | delivery methods compared to the money necessary for the project |
---|
67 | 67 | | using an alternative project delivery method, including private |
---|
68 | 68 | | financing; |
---|
69 | 69 | | (4) the amount of additional money available to other |
---|
70 | 70 | | regions of this state if the project is completed using an |
---|
71 | 71 | | alternative project delivery method, including private financing; |
---|
72 | 72 | | and |
---|
73 | 73 | | (5) the estimated cost of change orders for the |
---|
74 | 74 | | project if the project is completed using a public-private |
---|
75 | 75 | | partnership contract. |
---|
76 | 76 | | (c) Not later than December 31, 2023: |
---|
77 | 77 | | (1) the Texas Department of Transportation shall |
---|
78 | 78 | | conduct a comprehensive review of: |
---|
79 | 79 | | (A) all proposed road projects with a project |
---|
80 | 80 | | value of $1 billion or more and submit a report of those projects to |
---|
81 | 81 | | the comptroller for analysis under Subsection (b) of this section; |
---|
82 | 82 | | and |
---|
83 | 83 | | (B) the total cost to taxpayers for entering into |
---|
84 | 84 | | a public-private partnership agreement, including the cost of |
---|
85 | 85 | | entering into a managed lane agreement compared to the cost of |
---|
86 | 86 | | adding free lanes using a cost benefit analysis; and |
---|
87 | 87 | | (2) the Texas Water Development Board shall conduct a |
---|
88 | 88 | | comprehensive review of all projects in the state water plan with an |
---|
89 | 89 | | estimated project value of more than $1 billion and submit a report |
---|
90 | 90 | | of those projects to the comptroller for analysis under Subsection |
---|
91 | 91 | | (b) of this section. |
---|
92 | 92 | | (d) Not later than September 1, 2024, the comptroller of |
---|
93 | 93 | | public accounts shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
94 | 94 | | governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the |
---|
95 | 95 | | presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature |
---|
96 | 96 | | with jurisdiction over transportation and water matters a report on |
---|
97 | 97 | | the results of the study and analysis conducted under this section |
---|
98 | 98 | | and any recommendations of the comptroller relating to the study, |
---|
99 | 99 | | including any statutory changes necessary. |
---|
100 | 100 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2025. |
---|
101 | 101 | | SECTION 3. (a) In this section: |
---|
102 | 102 | | (1) "Comprehensive development agreement" has the |
---|
103 | 103 | | meaning assigned by Section 223.201, Transportation Code. |
---|
104 | 104 | | (2) "Department" means the Texas Department of |
---|
105 | 105 | | Transportation. |
---|
106 | 106 | | (3) "Institute" means the Texas A&M Transportation |
---|
107 | 107 | | Institute. |
---|
108 | 108 | | (b) The institute, in consultation with the department, |
---|
109 | 109 | | shall conduct a study on comprehensive development agreements |
---|
110 | 110 | | entered into for transportation projects in this state. The study |
---|
111 | 111 | | must include an analysis of: |
---|
112 | 112 | | (1) the contract provisions in comprehensive |
---|
113 | 113 | | development agreements relating to maintenance and safety; and |
---|
114 | 114 | | (2) the responsibilities of each party to the |
---|
115 | 115 | | comprehensive development agreements relating to maintenance and |
---|
116 | 116 | | safety. |
---|
117 | 117 | | (c) Not later than December 1, 2024, the institute shall |
---|
118 | 118 | | submit a report containing the results of the study conducted under |
---|
119 | 119 | | this section to the members of the legislature. |
---|
120 | 120 | | (d) This section expires January 1, 2025. |
---|
121 | 121 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|