Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 7, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 10, 2023