Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1314 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#443 | Journal Page: 1938 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Amended | 1-Zwiener | Journal Page: 1937 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1937 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1886 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended | 11-Morales Shaw | Journal Page: 1886 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended 11-Morales Shaw | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended 10-Zwiener and Talarico | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended 9-Wilson, et al. | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended 8-Bailes | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended 7-C. Morales | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amendment withdrawn | 5-Martinez Fischer | Journal Page: 1883 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Amendment withdrawn 5-Martinez Fischer | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended 4-S. Thompson | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended 3-Tinderholt | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1880 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1880 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 555 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed |