Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis April 21, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023