Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1363 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 H.B. No. 1363
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the repeal of the real estate inspection recovery fund.
66 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
77 SECTION 1. Section 1101.603(c), Occupations Code, is
88 amended to read as follows:
99 (c) Notwithstanding any other law, the commission shall
1010 deposit to the credit of the trust account [or the real estate
1111 inspection recovery fund, as determined by the commission,] an
1212 administrative penalty collected under Subchapter O [for a
1313 violation by a person licensed under this chapter or Chapter 1102].
1414 SECTION 2. Section 1102.114, Occupations Code, is amended
1515 to read as follows:
1616 Sec. 1102.114. ISSUANCE OF LICENSE. The commission shall
1717 issue the appropriate license to an applicant who:
1818 (1) meets the required qualifications; and
1919 (2) [pays the fee required by Section 1102.352(a); and
2020 [(3)] submits proof of financial responsibility as
2121 required by Section 1102.1141.
2222 SECTION 3. Section 1102.402, Occupations Code, is amended
2323 to read as follows:
2424 Sec. 1102.402. LICENSE INELIGIBILITY [REVOCATION] FOR
2525 CLAIM ON FUND. [(a) The commission may revoke a license issued
2626 under this chapter or a license, approval, or registration issued
2727 under Chapter 1101 if the commission makes a payment from the real
2828 estate inspection recovery fund to satisfy all or part of a judgment
2929 against the person issued the license, approval, or registration.
3030 [(b) The commission may probate an order revoking a license.
3131 [(c)] A person is not eligible for a license under this
3232 chapter until the person has reimbursed the commission in full for
3333 any amount paid on the person's behalf from the real estate
3434 inspection recovery fund under former Subchapter H, as that
3535 subchapter existed on August 31, 2023, or the real estate recovery
3636 trust account under Subchapter M, Chapter 1101, plus interest at
3737 the legal rate.
3838 SECTION 4. Section 1102.403(b), Occupations Code, is
3939 amended to read as follows:
4040 (b) An administrative penalty collected under this section
4141 for a violation by an inspector shall be deposited to the credit of
4242 the general revenue [real estate inspection recovery] fund. A
4343 penalty collected under this section for a violation by a person who
4444 is not licensed under this chapter or Chapter 1101 shall be
4545 deposited to the credit of the real estate recovery trust account or
4646 the general revenue [real estate inspection recovery] fund, as
4747 determined by the commission. Any amounts deposited to the credit
4848 of the general revenue fund under this section shall offset any
4949 amount required to be remitted to that fund by the commission.
5050 SECTION 5. The following provisions of the Occupations Code
5151 are repealed:
5252 (1) Section 1101.603(d); and
5353 (2) Subchapter H, Chapter 1102.
5454 SECTION 6. (a) In this section:
5555 (1) "Commission" means the Texas Real Estate
5656 Commission.
5757 (2) "Eligible inspector" means a person who holds a
5858 real estate inspector license or professional inspector license
5959 under Chapter 1102, Occupations Code, as of September 1, 2023.
6060 (b) Not later than December 31, 2023, the commission shall
6161 transfer not less than $200,000 from the real estate inspection
6262 recovery fund to the general revenue fund.
6363 (c) Not later than August 31, 2026, the commission shall
6464 determine the remaining liability of the real estate inspection
6565 recovery fund based on any pending claims for payment under former
6666 Subchapter H, Chapter 1102, Occupations Code, and shall set aside
6767 an amount in the fund equal to that liability to be used for the
6868 payment of those pending claims.
6969 (d) If funds remain in the real estate inspection recovery
7070 fund after setting aside the amount determined under Subsection (c)
7171 of this section, the commission shall set aside an additional
7272 amount not to exceed $10 per eligible inspector. The commission
7373 shall apply the amount set aside as a credit toward the renewal of
7474 the license of each eligible inspector whose license expires on or
7575 after September 30, 2026, and on or before September 30, 2028, and
7676 who renews the license on or before September 30, 2028.
7777 (e) After paying all claims for payment from the real estate
7878 inspection recovery fund and applying any credits under Subsection
7979 (d) of this section, the commission shall transfer any money
8080 remaining in the real estate inspection recovery fund to the
8181 general revenue fund.
8282 (f) Any money transferred to the general revenue fund under
8383 this section shall offset any amount required to be remitted to that
8484 fund by the commission.
8585 SECTION 7. (a) Section 1102.114, Occupations Code, as
8686 amended by this Act, applies only to an application for an inspector
8787 license submitted to the Texas Real Estate Commission on or after
8888 the effective date of this Act. An application for a license
8989 submitted before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
9090 law in effect on the date the application was submitted, and the
9191 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
9292 (b) The change in law made by this Act to Section 1102.402,
9393 Occupations Code, does not affect the authority of the Texas Real
9494 Estate Commission to revoke a license, approval, or registration,
9595 or probate an order revoking a license under that section as it
9696 existed before the effective date of this Act, for a payment made
9797 from the real estate inspection recovery fund based on a cause of
9898 action that accrues before the effective date of this Act, and the
9999 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
100100 (c) Sections 1101.603 and 1102.403, Occupations Code, as
101101 amended by this Act, apply only to an administrative penalty that is
102102 collected on or after the effective date of this Act. An
103103 administrative penalty that is collected before the effective date
104104 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
105105 administrative penalty was collected, and the former law is
106106 continued in effect for that purpose.
107107 (d) Subject to Subsection (e) of this section, the repeal by
108108 this Act of Subchapter H, Chapter 1102, Occupations Code, does not
109109 affect the validity of a claim for payment from the real estate
110110 inspection recovery fund based on a cause of action that accrues
111111 before the effective date of this Act. A claim for payment from the
112112 fund based on a cause of action that accrues before the effective
113113 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
114114 cause of action accrued, and the former law is continued in effect
115115 for that purpose.
116116 (e) A claim for payment from the real estate inspection
117117 recovery fund under former Section 1102.355, Occupations Code, for
118118 a cause of action that accrues before the effective date of this Act
119119 must be filed before March 1, 2026.
120120 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
121121 ______________________________ ______________________________
122122 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
123123 I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the House on April
124124 6, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
125125 voting.
126126 ______________________________
127127 Chief Clerk of the House
128128 I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the Senate on May
129129 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
130130 ______________________________
131131 Secretary of the Senate
132132 APPROVED: _____________________
133133 Date
134134 _____________________
135135 Governor