Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 14, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023