Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1378 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R3739 JG-D
 By: Ortega H.B. No. 1378


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report regarding Medicaid reimbursement rates,
 supplemental payment amounts, and access to care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (2)  "Supplemental payment amount" includes a payment
 made to a Medicaid provider under:
 (A)  the Texas Healthcare Transformation and
 Quality Improvement Program waiver issued under Section 1115 of the
 Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1315);
 (B)  another program operating under a waiver to
 the state Medicaid plan that provides a payment in excess of the
 Medicaid reimbursement rate; or
 (C)  the Medicaid disproportionate share hospital
 payment program.
 (b)  The commission shall prepare a written report on
 provider reimbursement rates, supplemental payment amounts paid to
 providers, and access to care under Medicaid. The commission shall
 collaborate with the state Medicaid managed care advisory committee
 to develop and define the scope of the research for the report. The
 report must:
 (1)  review the provider reimbursement rates and
 supplemental payment amounts for at least 20 Medicaid-covered
 services;
 (2)  outline factors of the reimbursement rate and
 supplemental payment amount methodologies used by Medicaid managed
 care organizations;
 (3)  propose alternative reimbursement and
 supplemental payment amount methodologies;
 (4)  evaluate the impact of Medicaid provider
 reimbursement rates and supplemental payment amounts on access to
 care for Medicaid recipients, including specifically evaluating
 the impact of Medicaid provider reimbursement rates and
 supplemental payment amounts for mental health and substance use
 disorder services on that access to care;
 (5)  compare the reimbursement rates and supplemental
 payment amounts paid to mental health and substance use disorder
 providers to the rates and amounts paid to other Medicaid
 providers;
 (6)  compare provider participation in Medicaid by
 region, particularly increases or decreases in the number of
 participating providers per year beginning with the state fiscal
 year ending August 31, 2012, categorized by provider specialty and
 subspecialty;
 (7)  list to the extent the information is available,
 for each state fiscal quarter beginning with the first quarter of
 the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2017:
 (A)  counties in which provider access standards
 relating to distance have not been met; and
 (B)  counties in which provider access standards
 relating to travel time have not been met;
 (8)  examine Medicaid directed provider payments and
 their effect on incentivizing providers to participate or continue
 participating in Medicaid, including:
 (A)  the uniform hospital rate increase program
 described by 1 T.A.C. Section 353.1305; and
 (B)  the quality incentive payment program
 (QIPP); and
 (9)  determine the feasibility and cost of
 establishing:
 (A)  a minimum fee schedule for Medicaid providers
 in counties where provider access standards are not being met; and
 (B)  a different reimbursement rate or
 supplemental payment amount for classes of providers who provide
 care in a county:
 (i)  located on an international border; or
 (ii)  with a Medicaid population at least 10
 percent higher than the statewide average Medicaid population.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2024, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature the report described by
 Subsection (b) of this section. Notwithstanding that subsection,
 the commission is not required to include in the report any
 information the commission determines is proprietary.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.