Senate | 05/05/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2814 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#925 | Journal Page: 2814 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2814 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2814 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2748 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Amended | 1-Rose | Journal Page: 2747 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2747 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2342 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1289 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed |