E
|
06/13/2023
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5972
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5294
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2681
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 299
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|